Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Insurance Administration, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023 /CH0115 (SB0228/CH0116)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Dental Coverage
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030 /CH0117 (SB0217/CH0118)
Title
Health Insurance – Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036 /CH0826 (SB0231)
Title
Insurance - Protections After Loss or Damage to Property
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0119 (SB0229/CH0120)
Title
Insurance - Penalties - Unauthorized Insurers, Insurance Producers, and Public Adjusters
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090 /CH0827 (SB0230/CH0828)
Title
Insurance - Hearing Representation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 (SB0227)
Title
Health Insurance - Cancellation of Individual Health Benefit Plans - Restriction
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252 /CH0121
Title
Insurance - Holding Companies - Group Capital Calculation and Liquidity Stress Test
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 /CH0118 (HB0030/CH0117)
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0227 (HB0240)
Title
Health Insurance – Cancellation of Individual Health Benefit Plans – Restriction
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0116 (HB0023/CH0115)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Dental Coverage
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 /CH0120 (HB0067/CH0119)
Title
Insurance - Penalties - Unauthorized Insurers, Insurance Producers, and Public Adjusters
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0230 /CH0828 (HB0090/CH0827)
Title
Insurance - Hearing Representation
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0231 (HB0036/CH0826)
Title
Insurance – Protections After Loss or Damage to Property
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 /CH0115 (SB0228/CH0116) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Dental Coverage By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Health and Government Operations
1/25/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB0030 /CH0117 (SB0217/CH0118) Health Insurance – Conformity With Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Health and Government Operations
1/25/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB0036 /CH0826 (SB0231) Insurance - Protections After Loss or Damage to Property By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 826
Economic Matters
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0067 /CH0119 (SB0229/CH0120) Insurance - Penalties - Unauthorized Insurers, Insurance Producers, and Public Adjusters By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Economic Matters
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0090 /CH0827 (SB0230/CH0828) Insurance - Hearing Representation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 827
Economic Matters
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0240 (SB0227) Health Insurance - Cancellation of Individual Health Benefit Plans - Restriction By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
1/25/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0252 /CH0121 Insurance - Holding Companies - Group Capital Calculation and Liquidity Stress Test By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Economic Matters
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0217 /CH0118 (HB0030/CH0117) Health Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0227 (HB0240) Health Insurance – Cancellation of Individual Health Benefit Plans – Restriction By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0228 /CH0116 (HB0023/CH0115) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Qualified Health Plans - Dental Coverage By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0229 /CH0120 (HB0067/CH0119) Insurance - Penalties - Unauthorized Insurers, Insurance Producers, and Public Adjusters By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0230 /CH0828 (HB0090/CH0827) Insurance - Hearing Representation By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 828
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0231 (HB0036/CH0826) Insurance – Protections After Loss or Damage to Property By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Finance
1/24/2024 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:40 PM
Click to return on the top page