Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Juvenile Services, Department Of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0135
Title
Juvenile Law - Committed Facilities - Extension of Termination Date
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117
Title
Juvenile Law - Commitment - Placement Visits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118 /CH0033
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Services Education - Facilities
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122 /CH0035
Title
Juvenile Law - Detention - Community Detention Violation Hearings
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Departmental
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
SB0116 /CH0135 Juvenile Law - Committed Facilities - Extension of Termination Date By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0117 Juvenile Law - Commitment - Placement Visits By Request - Departmental 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0118 /CH0033 Juvenile Law - Juvenile Services Education - Facilities By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 /CH0035 Juvenile Law - Detention - Community Detention Violation Hearings By Request - Departmental 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page