Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Pensions, Joint Committee On

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376 /CH0221 (SB0269/CH0220)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Correction of Errors in Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 (SB0475)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Payments and Deductions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494 /CH0480 (SB0477/CH0479)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in Service
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495 /CH0478 (SB0476/CH0477)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496 /CH0476 (SB0474/CH0475)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Method and Amortization of Unfunded Liabilities or Surpluses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 /CH0551 (SB0801/CH0550)
Title
State Retirement and Pension Systems - Cost-of-Living Adjustments - Simplification and Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0269 /CH0220 (HB0376/CH0221)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Correction of Errors in Benefits
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474 /CH0475 (HB0496/CH0476)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Method and Amortization of Unfunded Liabilities or Surpluses
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475 (HB0379)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Payments and Deductions
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476 /CH0477 (HB0495/CH0478)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0477 /CH0479 (HB0494/CH0480)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in Service
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 /CH0550 (HB0852/CH0551)
Title
State Retirement and Pension Systems - Cost-of-Living Adjustments - Simplification and Clarification
Sponsorship Type
By Request - Other
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsorship Type Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0376 /CH0221 (SB0269/CH0220) State Retirement and Pension System - Correction of Errors in Benefits By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 221
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 AM
HB0379 (SB0475) State Retirement and Pension System - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Payments and Deductions By Request - Other 6 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB0494 /CH0480 (SB0477/CH0479) State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in Service By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 AM
HB0495 /CH0478 (SB0476/CH0477) State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 478
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 AM
HB0496 /CH0476 (SB0474/CH0475) State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Method and Amortization of Unfunded Liabilities or Surpluses By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 AM
HB0852 /CH0551 (SB0801/CH0550) State Retirement and Pension Systems - Cost-of-Living Adjustments - Simplification and Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 AM
SB0269 /CH0220 (HB0376/CH0221) State Retirement and Pension System - Correction of Errors in Benefits By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2013 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0474 /CH0475 (HB0496/CH0476) State Retirement and Pension System - Funding Method and Amortization of Unfunded Liabilities or Surpluses By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 (HB0379) State Retirement and Pension System - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Payments and Deductions By Request - Other 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 AM
SB0476 /CH0477 (HB0495/CH0478) State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 477
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2013 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0477 /CH0479 (HB0494/CH0480) State Retirement and Pension System - Employment of Retirees - Required Break in Service By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 479
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2013 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 /CH0550 (HB0852/CH0551) State Retirement and Pension Systems - Cost-of-Living Adjustments - Simplification and Clarification By Request - Other 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 550
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page