Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Acupuncturists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0379/CH0160)
Title
State Acupuncture Board and State Board of Dietetic Practice - Action and Penalties for Violations of Practice Acts and Supervisory Authority of Acupuncturists
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379 /CH0160 (HB0304)
Title
State Acupuncture Board and State Board of Dietetic Practice - Action and Penalties for Violations of Practice Acts and Supervisory Authority of Acupuncturists
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0304 (SB0379/CH0160) State Acupuncture Board and State Board of Dietetic Practice - Action and Penalties for Violations of Practice Acts and Supervisory Authority of Acupuncturists Delegate Reznik 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0379 /CH0160 (HB0304) State Acupuncture Board and State Board of Dietetic Practice - Action and Penalties for Violations of Practice Acts and Supervisory Authority of Acupuncturists Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page