Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Aging, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690 /CH0306 (SB0679/CH0305)
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 /CH0657
Title
Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245 (SB0822)
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0178
Title
Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0679 /CH0305 (HB0690/CH0306)
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0822 (HB1245)
Title
Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0690 /CH0306 (SB0679/CH0305) Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0957 /CH0657 Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1245 (SB0822) Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0083 /CH0178 Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0679 /CH0305 (HB0690/CH0306) Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Finance
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0822 (HB1245) Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Safety Net Act of 2013 Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page