Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Airports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725 (SB0883)
Title
State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0817
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917
Title
Maryland Aviation Administration - Contract Authority - Transportation Companies
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123
Title
Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB0725)
Title
State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other Rights
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0725 (SB0883) State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other Rights Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0817 Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0917 Maryland Aviation Administration - Contract Authority - Transportation Companies Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1123 Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014 Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0883 (HB0725) State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other Rights Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page