Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Airports

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 (SB0409)
Title
Maryland Aviation Administration - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Management of Food Service and Retail Concessions
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 /CH0154 (SB0072/CH0153)
Title
Citizens Committee for the Enhancement of Communities Surrounding Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264 /CH0480
Title
Task Force to Investigate the Challenges of and Opportunities for Minorities in Business
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333
Title
Commission to Study the Employment of Ethnic Minorities and Women Under Procurement Contracts at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0500 (SB1086)
Title
Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1574 (SB1070)
Title
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0153 (HB0233/CH0154)
Title
Citizens Committee for the Enhancement of Communities Surrounding Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Membership
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 (HB0228)
Title
Maryland Aviation Administration - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Management of Food Service and Retail Concessions
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070 (HB1574)
Title
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1086 (HB0500)
Title
Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0228 (SB0409) Maryland Aviation Administration - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Management of Food Service and Retail Concessions Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/12/2016 - 12:00 PM
HB0233 /CH0154 (SB0072/CH0153) Citizens Committee for the Enhancement of Communities Surrounding Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Membership Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0264 /CH0480 Task Force to Investigate the Challenges of and Opportunities for Minorities in Business Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Economic Matters
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0333 Commission to Study the Employment of Ethnic Minorities and Women Under Procurement Contracts at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/12/2016 - 12:00 PM
HB0500 (SB1086) Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in Maryland Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1574 (SB1070) Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0072 /CH0153 (HB0233/CH0154) Citizens Committee for the Enhancement of Communities Surrounding Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Membership Senator DeGrange 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0409 (HB0228) Maryland Aviation Administration - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Management of Food Service and Retail Concessions Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1070 (HB1574) Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - Preferences Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB1086 (HB0500) Task Force to Study the Capital Needs of Disadvantaged, Minority, and Small Businesses in Maryland Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page