Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Alternative Dispute Resolution -see also- Arbitra; Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 (SB0250)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0250 (HB1170)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0992 Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1170 (SB0250) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0250 (HB1170) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0446 Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page