Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Amusement Parks and Carnivals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 (SB0892)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB1114)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965
Title
Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0720 Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB1043 Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1114 (SB0892) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 (HB1114) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0965 Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page