Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Annapolis

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0906)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 1 Martin Street Renovation
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 (SB0907)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 206 West Social Enterprise Project
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0493 (SB0488)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Police Department Firing Range
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 (SB0951)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 /CH0456
Title
Anne Arundel County - Collection of Hotel Taxes and Distribution of Revenues - City of Annapolis
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0488 (HB0493)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Police Department Firing Range
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906 (HB0008)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 1 Martin Street Renovation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 (HB0107)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 206 West Social Enterprise Project
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 (HB0986)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1008
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Anne Arundel County - Charles Carroll House
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0906) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 1 Martin Street Renovation Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 10:00 AM
HB0107 (SB0907) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 206 West Social Enterprise Project Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 10:00 AM
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0493 (SB0488) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Police Department Firing Range Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 10:00 AM
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0986 (SB0951) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1409 /CH0456 Anne Arundel County - Collection of Hotel Taxes and Distribution of Revenues - City of Annapolis Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0488 (HB0493) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Police Department Firing Range Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 12:00 PM
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Senator Reilly 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0906 (HB0008) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 1 Martin Street Renovation Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 12:00 PM
SB0907 (HB0107) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 206 West Social Enterprise Project Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 12:00 PM
SB0951 (HB0986) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Rules
SB1008 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Anne Arundel County - Charles Carroll House Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page