Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Assault

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255 /CH0159 (SB0349/CH0158)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0260 (SB0780)
Title
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484 (SB0861)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 /CH0703
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Common Law Battery
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - Educators
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0349 /CH0158 (HB0255/CH0159)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and Notification
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0780 (HB0260)
Title
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0484)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1154
Title
Criminal Law - Assault by Strangulation or Suffocation - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0255 /CH0159 (SB0349/CH0158) Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and Notification Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0260 (SB0780) Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits Delegate Queen 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0484 (SB0861) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0836 /CH0703 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Common Law Battery Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 703
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 Criminal Law - Assault in the Second Degree - Educators Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0349 /CH0158 (HB0255/CH0159) Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Victims' Rights - Disposal of Rape Kit Evidence and Notification Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0780 (HB0260) Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0484) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1154 Criminal Law - Assault by Strangulation or Suffocation - Penalties Senator Oaks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page