Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Audiologists and Speech Pathologists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258 /CH0093 (SB0295)
Title
State Board of Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0403 (SB0453/CH0167)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Cease and Desist Orders and Injunctive Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0457
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295 (HB0258/CH0093)
Title
State Board of Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0453 /CH0167 (HB0403)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Cease and Desist Orders and Injunctive Relief
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514
Title
Speech-Language Pathologists - License Renewal Requirements - National Certification
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0258 /CH0093 (SB0295) State Board of Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0403 (SB0453/CH0167) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Cease and Desist Orders and Injunctive Relief Delegate Cullison 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1456 /CH0457 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - Jurisdiction Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0295 (HB0258/CH0093) State Board of Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0453 /CH0167 (HB0403) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Cease and Desist Orders and Injunctive Relief Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0514 Speech-Language Pathologists - License Renewal Requirements - National Certification Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:45 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page