Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Capital Budget (B5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0457)
Title
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151 (SB0191/CH0027)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 (SB0324/CH0013)
Title
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 (SB0379/CH0198)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722 /CH0666 (SB0271/CH0665)
Title
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 /CH0027 (HB0151)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 /CH0665 (HB0722/CH0666)
Title
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms - Funding
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0061
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 /CH0013 (HB0309)
Title
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379 /CH0198 (HB0463)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457 (HB0108)
Title
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 (SB0457) Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2016 - 3:00 PM
HB0151 (SB0191/CH0027) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
HB0309 (SB0324/CH0013) Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016 Delegate Busch 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Appropriations
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0463 (SB0379/CH0198) Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0722 /CH0666 (SB0271/CH0665) Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms - Funding Delegate Hixson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0191 /CH0027 (HB0151) Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015 President 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0271 /CH0665 (HB0722/CH0666) Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms - Funding Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 665
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0280 /CH0061 Academic Facilities Bonding Authority Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0324 /CH0013 (HB0309) Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016 Senator Miller 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0379 /CH0198 (HB0463) Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0457 (HB0108) Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship Requirements Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page