Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Beverage Containers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0125
Title
Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277
Title
Criminal Law - Alcohol Offenses and Gaming - Civil Offenses (Decriminalization of Petty Nonviolent Offenses Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762 /CH0277 (SB0447/CH0276)
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Wine Privilege – Cheese and Deli Shops
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 /CH0276 (HB0762/CH0277)
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Wine Privilege – Cheese and Deli Shops
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628
Title
Criminal Law – Alcohol Offenses and Gaming – Civil Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0178 /CH0125 Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0277 Criminal Law - Alcohol Offenses and Gaming - Civil Offenses (Decriminalization of Petty Nonviolent Offenses Act) Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
HB0762 /CH0277 (SB0447/CH0276) Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Wine Privilege – Cheese and Deli Shops Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0447 /CH0276 (HB0762/CH0277) Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Wine Privilege – Cheese and Deli Shops Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0628 Criminal Law – Alcohol Offenses and Gaming – Civil Offenses Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page