Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Bingo

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367 (SB0441/CH0060)
Title
Worcester County - Bingo Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Worcester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452 (SB1058)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0195
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 /CH0060 (HB0367)
Title
Worcester County - Bingo Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1058 (HB1452)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0367 (SB0441/CH0060) Worcester County - Bingo Board - Repeal Worcester County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0573 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1452 (SB1058) Anne Arundel County - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - Regulation Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0195 Harford County - Charitable Gaming Senator Glassman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0441 /CH0060 (HB0367) Worcester County - Bingo Board - Repeal Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1058 (HB1452) Anne Arundel County - Electronic Instant Bingo Machines - Regulation Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page