Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Burglary

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0608 (SB1011)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906 /CH0628
Title
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Home Invasion
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0927
Title
Criminal Law - Trespass, Petty Theft, and Disturbing the Peace - Alteration of Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561
Title
Public Safety - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Ineligibility
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011 (HB0608)
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0608 (SB1011) Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 /CH0628 Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Home Invasion Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 628
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0927 Criminal Law - Trespass, Petty Theft, and Disturbing the Peace - Alteration of Penalties Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0561 Public Safety - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Ineligibility Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1011 (HB0608) Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page