Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Caroline County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0820 (SB0436/CH0821)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673 (SB0022)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1422 /CH0242 (SB1072/CH0243)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 /CH0533 (SB0575)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1595
Title
Education - Per Pupil Adequacy Target Grant - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 (HB0673)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0821 (HB0554/CH0820)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 /CH0606
Title
Rural Health Collaborative Pilot
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1072 /CH0243 (HB1422/CH0242)
Title
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Sponsor
Caroline County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0554 /CH0820 (SB0436/CH0821) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries Caroline County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0673 (SB0022) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1422 /CH0242 (SB1072/CH0243) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License Caroline County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1499 /CH0533 (SB0575) Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud Reporting Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Economic Matters
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1595 Education - Per Pupil Adequacy Target Grant - Established Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0022 (HB0673) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0436 /CH0821 (HB0554/CH0820) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Kent County – Sheriffs’ Salaries Caroline County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1056 /CH0606 Rural Health Collaborative Pilot Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1072 /CH0243 (HB1422/CH0242) Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License Caroline County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page