Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Census

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409 /CH0521 (SB0443)
Title
Land Use - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 (SB0361)
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 (HB0832)
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0409/CH0521)
Title
Land Use - Local Governments - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycles
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 /CH0520
Title
Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0409 /CH0521 (SB0443) Land Use - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0832 (SB0361) Congressional Districting Process Delegate Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0361 (HB0832) Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 (HB0409/CH0521) Land Use - Local Governments - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycles Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0671 /CH0520 Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning Cycle Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page