Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Charles County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0007 /CH0346
Title
Southern Maryland Higher Education Council - Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 (SB0239/CH0034)
Title
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 /CH0085
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages Licensees - Nonalcoholic Items - Hours of Sale
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173
Title
Vehicle Laws - Charles County - Golf Cart Zones
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0631
Title
Charles County - Building Code - Abatement of Violations
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995 (SB0868)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Children's Aid Society Building Addition
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997 (SB0867)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation Center
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 /CH0293 (SB0586/CH0292)
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 - Charles County - Mattawoman Creek Art Center
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0034 (HB0083)
Title
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 /CH0292 (HB1019/CH0293)
Title
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the Arts
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867 (HB0997)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation Center
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 (HB0995)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Children's Aid Society Building Addition
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0007 /CH0346 Southern Maryland Higher Education Council - Modifications Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Appropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0083 (SB0239/CH0034) Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0172 /CH0085 Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages Licensees - Nonalcoholic Items - Hours of Sale Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0173 Vehicle Laws - Charles County - Golf Cart Zones Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0653 /CH0631 Charles County - Building Code - Abatement of Violations Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0995 (SB0868) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Children's Aid Society Building Addition Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0997 (SB0867) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation Center Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1019 /CH0293 (SB0586/CH0292) Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1366 Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0159 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 - Charles County - Mattawoman Creek Art Center Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0239 /CH0034 (HB0083) Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0586 /CH0292 (HB1019/CH0293) Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland Region Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0866 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the Arts Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0867 (HB0997) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation Center Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0868 (HB0995) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Children's Aid Society Building Addition Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page