Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Chiropractors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798 (SB0608)
Title
Environment - Radiation Sources - Podiatry and Chiropractic Radiation Machines
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290 (SB0837)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310 (SB0834)
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider"
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608 (HB0798)
Title
Environment - Radiation Sources - Podiatry and Chiropractic Radiation Machines
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1290)
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0798 (SB0608) Environment - Radiation Sources - Podiatry and Chiropractic Radiation Machines Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1115 /CH0404 (SB0593) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
HB1290 (SB0837) Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays Delegate Frank 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1310 (SB0834) Health Care Malpractice Claims - Definition of "Health Care Provider" Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0593 (HB1115/CH0404) Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from Liability Senator Montgomery 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 (HB0798) Environment - Radiation Sources - Podiatry and Chiropractic Radiation Machines Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1290) Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on Stays Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page