Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Cigarettes -see also- Smoking

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0354 (SB0624)
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 (SB0474)
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474 (HB0541)
Title
Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 (HB0354)
Title
Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669
Title
Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0354 (SB0624) Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0541 (SB0474) Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0474 (HB0541) Cigarette Restitution Fund - Establishment of Behavioral Health Treatment Account and Funding for Substance Use Treatment Services Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Finance
SB0624 (HB0354) Clean Indoor Air Act - Use of Electronic Cigarette Devices - Prohibition Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0669 Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page