Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Commercial Property

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384
Title
Prince George’s County – Business Improvement Districts – Sale of Commercial Property PG 403–24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 (SB0484)
Title
Land Use – Affordable Housing – Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
State Transfer Tax – Rates and Distribution of Revenue – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0697 (SB1169)
Title
Real Estate Brokers – Commercial Transactions – Buyer’s Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 (SB0650)
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Notice and Removal of Item or Symbol (Hate Crimes Graffiti Removal Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Vogel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1452 (SB1146)
Title
Columbia Association - Lease Requirements and Governing Documents Ho. Co. 4-24
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650 (HB0699)
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Notice and Removal of Item or Symbol
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906
Title
Housing and Community Development - Conversion of Commercial Buildings for Residential Use - Report
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1146 (HB1452)
Title
Columbia Association - Lease Requirements and Governing Documents Ho. Co. 4-24
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1169 (HB0697)
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Commercial Transactions - Buyer's Rights
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0384 Prince George’s County – Business Improvement Districts – Sale of Commercial Property PG 403–24 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0538 (SB0484) Land Use – Affordable Housing – Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0638 State Transfer Tax – Rates and Distribution of Revenue – Alterations Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0697 (SB1169) Real Estate Brokers – Commercial Transactions – Buyer’s Rights Delegate Griffith 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0699 (SB0650) Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Notice and Removal of Item or Symbol (Hate Crimes Graffiti Removal Act) Delegate Vogel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1452 (SB1146) Columbia Association - Lease Requirements and Governing Documents Ho. Co. 4-24 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0650 (HB0699) Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Notice and Removal of Item or Symbol Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0906 Housing and Community Development - Conversion of Commercial Buildings for Residential Use - Report Senator Augustine 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB1146 (HB1452) Columbia Association - Lease Requirements and Governing Documents Ho. Co. 4-24 Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1169 (HB0697) Real Estate Brokers - Commercial Transactions - Buyer's Rights Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:09 AM
Click to return on the top page