Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Condemnation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 (SB0460/CH0174)
Title
Public Utilities - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711
Title
Charles County - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Authority
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333
Title
Calvert County - Improvements to County Roads and Related Infrastructure - "Quick-Take" Condemnation
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 /CH0174 (HB0469)
Title
Public Utilities - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
Ways and Means
HB0469 (SB0460/CH0174) Public Utilities - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines Delegate Jameson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0711 Charles County - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Authority Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0333 Calvert County - Improvements to County Roads and Related Infrastructure - "Quick-Take" Condemnation Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0460 /CH0174 (HB0469) Public Utilities - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page