Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

County Commissioners

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0491
Title
Charles County - School Construction Excise Tax Rates
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599 /CH0439 (SB0839)
Title
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 (SB0838/CH0386)
Title
St. Mary's County - Animal Regulations
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 /CH0446
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - Commissioner Terms MC/PG 105-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0973
Title
Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 (SB0752)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 (SB0637/CH0188)
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171 (SB0923)
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0142
Title
Carroll County - Gaming Events
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333
Title
Calvert County - Improvements to County Roads and Related Infrastructure - "Quick-Take" Condemnation
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 /CH0162
Title
Calvert County - Budget Hearings and Procedures
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637 /CH0188 (HB1170)
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 (HB0993)
Title
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0838 /CH0386 (HB0616)
Title
St. Mary's County - Animal Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839 (HB0599/CH0439)
Title
St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0923 (HB1171)
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0938
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Land-Based Wind Generating Stations in Kent County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 /CH0491 Charles County - School Construction Excise Tax Rates Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0280 Carroll County - Gaming Events Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0599 /CH0439 (SB0839) St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0616 (SB0838/CH0386) St. Mary's County - Animal Regulations St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0652 /CH0446 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - Commissioner Terms MC/PG 105-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0973 Local AIDS Prevention Sterile Needle and Syringe Exchange Programs Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 (SB0752) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1170 (SB0637/CH0188) Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1171 (SB0923) Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0004 /CH0142 Carroll County - Gaming Events Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142
Budget and Taxation
1/15/2015 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0333 Calvert County - Improvements to County Roads and Related Infrastructure - "Quick-Take" Condemnation Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0360 /CH0162 Calvert County - Budget Hearings and Procedures Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 /CH0188 (HB1170) Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0752 (HB0993) Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining Disputes Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0838 /CH0386 (HB0616) St. Mary's County - Animal Regulations Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0839 (HB0599/CH0439) St. Mary's County - Violations of Ordinances, Rules, and Regulations - Penalties Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0923 (HB1171) Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans Washington County Senators 4 2 In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0938 Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Land-Based Wind Generating Stations in Kent County Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page