Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Human Relations (D5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0487)
Title
Home Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 /CH0548 (SB0784/CH0547)
Title
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to Pregnancy
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1334
Title
Employment Discrimination - Leave for Pregnancy and Childbirth
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1527
Title
Anne Arundel County - Human Relations - Violations of County Discrimination Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449
Title
Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 (HB0603)
Title
Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of Income
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 /CH0547 (HB0804/CH0548)
Title
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to Pregnancy
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0603 (SB0487) Home Act of 2013 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0804 /CH0548 (SB0784/CH0547) Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to Pregnancy Delegate Hucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Economic Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1334 Employment Discrimination - Leave for Pregnancy and Childbirth Delegate Kelly, A. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
Appropriations
HB1527 Anne Arundel County - Human Relations - Violations of County Discrimination Laws Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0449 Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2013 Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 (HB0603) Human Relations - Housing Discrimination - Source of Income Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) (23-22)
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0784 /CH0547 (HB0804/CH0548) Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to Pregnancy Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 547
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page