Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Disabilities, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1105 (SB0761/CH0382)
Title
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 /CH0388
Title
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761 /CH0382 (HB1105)
Title
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH0387
Title
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1105 (SB0761/CH0382) Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program Delegate Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1161 /CH0388 Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators Delegate Krimm 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Health and Government Operations
4/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0761 /CH0382 (HB1105) Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0853 /CH0387 Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page