Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Divorce -see also- Annulment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535
Title
Court Fees - Surcharge on Divorce Petitions - Distribution to the Domestic Violence Program Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0748 (SB0503)
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0792)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195
Title
Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on Rentals
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Absolute Divorce - Time Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0503 (HB0748)
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 (HB1099)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0535 Court Fees - Surcharge on Divorce Petitions - Distribution to the Domestic Violence Program Fund Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0748 (SB0503) Family Law - Grounds for Divorce Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 (SB0792) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1195 Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on Rentals Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
SB0104 Family Law - Grounds for Absolute Divorce - Time Requirements Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0503 (HB0748) Family Law - Grounds for Divorce Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 (HB1099) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page