Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Driver Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0778)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Daylight Driving Discount for Seniors
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1048
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1203
Title
Motor Vehicles - Registration - Class S (Drivers' School) Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 (HB0172)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0172 (SB0778) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Daylight Driving Discount for Seniors Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1048 Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education - Licensing Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1203 Motor Vehicles - Registration - Class S (Drivers' School) Vehicle Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0778 (HB0172) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page