Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Eastern Shore

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 /CH0470 (SB0137/CH0469)
Title
Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 (SB1097)
Title
Mental Hygiene Administration - Upper Shore Community Mental Health Center - Reopening and Maintenance
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0469 (HB1024/CH0470)
Title
Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1097 (HB1144)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1024 /CH0470 (SB0137/CH0469) Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1144 (SB1097) Mental Hygiene Administration - Upper Shore Community Mental Health Center - Reopening and Maintenance Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0469 (HB1024/CH0470) Rural Maryland Prosperity Investment Fund - Revisions and Extension of Termination Date Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 469
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1097 (HB1144) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Workgroup to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page