Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Elections, State Board of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0137
Title
Election Law - Polling Places - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0196 /CH0198 (SB0171/CH0197)
Title
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217 (SB0373)
Title
Early Voting Access Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224 /CH0158 (SB0279/CH0157)
Title
Election Law - Improving Access to Voting
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325
Title
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570
Title
State Government - Inspector General
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592
Title
Election Law - Reporting of Precinct Results
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 (SB0367)
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0758
Title
Election Law - Polling Places - Waiting Times to Vote
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot List
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1044 (SB0584)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0240)
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171 /CH0197 (HB0196/CH0198)
Title
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 (HB1269)
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 /CH0157 (HB0224/CH0158)
Title
Election Law - Improving Access to Voting
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0367 (HB0729)
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0373 (HB0217)
Title
Early Voting Access Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583
Title
Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0584 (HB1044)
Title
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0901
Title
Election Law - Elections by Mail
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056
Title
Election Law - Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Disclosure
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0137 Election Law - Polling Places - Proof of Identity Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0196 /CH0198 (SB0171/CH0197) Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Ways and Means
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0217 (SB0373) Early Voting Access Act of 2013 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0224 /CH0158 (SB0279/CH0157) Election Law - Improving Access to Voting Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0233 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0325 Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of Identity Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0570 State Government - Inspector General Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0592 Election Law - Reporting of Precinct Results Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0729 (SB0367) Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0758 Election Law - Polling Places - Waiting Times to Vote Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0974 Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot List Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1044 (SB0584) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 (SB0240) Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0171 /CH0197 (HB0196/CH0198) Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail Senator Forehand 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0240 (HB1269) Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0279 /CH0157 (HB0224/CH0158) Election Law - Improving Access to Voting President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0367 (HB0729) Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0373 (HB0217) Early Voting Access Act of 2013 Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0583 Election Law - Public Campaign Financing of Local Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0584 (HB1044) Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly Elections Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0901 Election Law - Elections by Mail Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 President 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1056 Election Law - Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Disclosure Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page