Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Engineers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383 /CH0674 (SB0426/CH0673)
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0734
Title
State Procurement - Preference for Resident Bidders or Offerors
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0871 /CH0636 (SB0234)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877 (SB0237)
Title
Civil Actions - Damage or Loss Related to Property Occurring After Completion of Improvement to Real Property
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1041
Title
State Wetlands - Nonstructural Shoreline Stabilization Requirement - Waiver
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428 (SB0748)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0361
Title
Professional Engineers - Engineering Documents Prepared at the Request of the State or Political Subdivision of the State - Signing and Sealing
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 (HB0871/CH0636)
Title
Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0237 (HB0877)
Title
Civil Actions - Damage or Loss Related to Property Occurring After Completion of Improvement to Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0426 /CH0673 (HB0383/CH0674)
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 (HB1428)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0383 /CH0674 (SB0426/CH0673) Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis Delegate Busch 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0734 State Procurement - Preference for Resident Bidders or Offerors Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0871 /CH0636 (SB0234) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0877 (SB0237) Civil Actions - Damage or Loss Related to Property Occurring After Completion of Improvement to Real Property Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1041 State Wetlands - Nonstructural Shoreline Stabilization Requirement - Waiver Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1428 (SB0748) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0226 /CH0361 Professional Engineers - Engineering Documents Prepared at the Request of the State or Political Subdivision of the State - Signing and Sealing Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0234 (HB0871/CH0636) Agreements to Defend or Pay the Cost of Defense - Void Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0237 (HB0877) Civil Actions - Damage or Loss Related to Property Occurring After Completion of Improvement to Real Property Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0426 /CH0673 (HB0383/CH0674) Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis Senator Astle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 673
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0748 (HB1428) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act - Application Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page