Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Flags

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0203 (SB0036)
Title
State and County Governments - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State and County Building Grounds
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0094
Title
General Provisions Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0104
Title
General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0036 (HB0203)
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0203 (SB0036) State and County Governments - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State and County Building Grounds Delegate Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0270 /CH0094 General Provisions Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0969 /CH0104 General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0036 (HB0203) State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page