Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Gangs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360 (SB0528)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816
Title
Courts - Evidence - Membership in or Association With a Criminal Gang
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0528 (HB0360)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0360 (SB0528) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (87-51)
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0816 Courts - Evidence - Membership in or Association With a Criminal Gang Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0528 (HB0360) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Senator Raskin 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 5 of 2016
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page