Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Health Planning and Cost Review

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887 (SB0606/CH0372)
Title
Health Insurance - Abuse-Deterrent Opioid Analgesic Drug Products - Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010 (SB0586)
Title
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificates of Need - Application of Bed Need Projections
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586 (HB1010)
Title
Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0606 /CH0372 (HB0887)
Title
Health Insurance - Abuse-Deterrent Opioid Analgesic Drug Products - Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0887 (SB0606/CH0372) Health Insurance - Abuse-Deterrent Opioid Analgesic Drug Products - Coverage Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1010 (SB0586) Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1256 Maryland Health Care Commission - Certificates of Need - Application of Bed Need Projections Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0586 (HB1010) Health Insurance - Federal and State Mental Health and Addiction Parity Laws - Report on Compliance Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0606 /CH0372 (HB0887) Health Insurance - Abuse-Deterrent Opioid Analgesic Drug Products - Coverage Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page