Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Insects -see also- Bees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 (SB0344/CH0342)
Title
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 (SB0256)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 (SB0801)
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0881)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0342 (HB0658)
Title
Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 (HB1169)
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0658 (SB0344/CH0342) Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0881 (SB0256) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1169 (SB0801) Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0256 (HB0881) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 /CH0342 (HB0658) Public Health - Emergency and Allergy Treatment Program Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 (HB1169) Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page