Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

International Affairs -see also- Foreign Trade

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760
Title
Family Law - Out-of-State Civil Unions - Applicability of Domestic Relations Laws
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909
Title
Procurement - Purchasing Products Containing Chicken Processed in China - Prohibition on Use of State Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938
Title
Health - General - Poultry Processed in the People's Republic of China - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998 (SB0647)
Title
Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0011
Title
Commemoration of World Autism Awareness Day
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0647 (HB0998)
Title
Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - International Education
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002
Title
Acknowledgment of the Sufferings of Sexually Enslaved Women ("Comfort Women") During World War II
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0465 State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0760 Family Law - Out-of-State Civil Unions - Applicability of Domestic Relations Laws Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0909 Procurement - Purchasing Products Containing Chicken Processed in China - Prohibition on Use of State Funds Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0938 Health - General - Poultry Processed in the People's Republic of China - Notice Requirements Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0998 (SB0647) Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1272 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Birth Registrations - Notice of Placement of Security Freezes Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0011 Commemoration of World Autism Awareness Day Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 PM
SB0647 (HB0998) Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - Prohibition Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1000 Historically Black Colleges and Universities - International Education Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SJ0002 Acknowledgment of the Sufferings of Sexually Enslaved Women ("Comfort Women") During World War II Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page