Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Lobbying

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141
Title
Ethics Law - Soliciting the Employment of Lobbyist
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
General Assembly - Advocating for or Directing an Entity to Hire a Member's Relative - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0144
Title
Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Officials
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222
Title
General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial Interests
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1193
Title
Ethics - Lobbying Registration - State and Local Government Entities and Associations
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397 (SB1065)
Title
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Bobo
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0300
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Prohibited Members
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0665
Title
Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1065 (HB1397)
Title
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0141 Ethics Law - Soliciting the Employment of Lobbyist Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0142 General Assembly - Advocating for or Directing an Entity to Hire a Member's Relative - Prohibited Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0144 Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Officials Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0222 General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial Interests Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1193 Ethics - Lobbying Registration - State and Local Government Entities and Associations Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1397 (SB1065) Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and Enforcement Delegate Bobo 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0300 Baltimore County - Board of Education - Prohibited Members Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0665 Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting Requirements Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1065 (HB1397) Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and Enforcement Senator Raskin 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page