Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Mentors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823
Title
Education - Public School Teachers - Preparation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 (SB0669)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1525 (SB0727)
Title
State Personnel – Employee Mentoring Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 (HB0827)
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0727 (HB1525)
Title
State Personnel - Employee Mentoring Leave
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0823 Education - Public School Teachers - Preparation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 (SB0669) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1525 (SB0727) State Personnel – Employee Mentoring Leave Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0669 (HB0827) Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion Program Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0727 (HB1525) State Personnel - Employee Mentoring Leave Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM
Click to return on the top page