Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Midwives

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0569
Title
Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician Assistant
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909 (SB0862)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437 /CH0528 (SB1114/CH0529)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862 (HB0909)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1114 /CH0529 (HB1437/CH0528)
Title
Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0569 Vital Statistics and Records – Definition of Licensed Health Care Practitioner – Certified Nurse Midwife, Licensed Clinical Professional Counselor, and Physician Assistant Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0909 (SB0862) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1437 /CH0528 (SB1114/CH0529) Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0862 (HB0909) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB1114 /CH0529 (HB1437/CH0528) Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act - Revisions Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM
Click to return on the top page