Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Milk Products

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1016 (SB0646)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - King Farm Farmstead Dairy Barns
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 /CH0077 (SB0558/CH0076)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 /CH0076 (HB1035/CH0077)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0646 (HB1016)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - King Farm Farmstead Dairy Barns
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1016 (SB0646) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - King Farm Farmstead Dairy Barns Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
HB1035 /CH0077 (SB0558/CH0076) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0558 /CH0076 (HB1035/CH0077) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 76
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0646 (HB1016) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - King Farm Farmstead Dairy Barns Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page