Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Monuments and Memorials

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173
Title
Commission on the Solemn Remembrance of the Victims of Lynching
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0713)
Title
State Government - Roger Brooke Taney Statue - Removal and Destruction
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0552 (SB0399)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Desert Storm, Operation Enduring Freedom, and Operation Iraqi Freedom Memorial
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987 (SB0900)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Lefty Grove Statue
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1444 /CH0652
Title
Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1585 (SB1087)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Friendsville Veterans Memorial
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399 (HB0552)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Desert Storm, Operation Enduring Freedom, and Operation Iraqi Freedom Memorial
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0713 (HB0532)
Title
State Government - Roger Brooke Taney Statue - Removal and Storage
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 (HB0987)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Lefty Grove Statue
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1087 (HB1585)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Friendsville Veterans Memorial
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0173 Commission on the Solemn Remembrance of the Victims of Lynching Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0532 (SB0713) State Government - Roger Brooke Taney Statue - Removal and Destruction Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0552 (SB0399) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Desert Storm, Operation Enduring Freedom, and Operation Iraqi Freedom Memorial Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
HB0987 (SB0900) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Lefty Grove Statue Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB1444 /CH0652 Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore City Delegate Aumann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1585 (SB1087) Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Friendsville Veterans Memorial Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0399 (HB0552) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Desert Storm, Operation Enduring Freedom, and Operation Iraqi Freedom Memorial Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0713 (HB0532) State Government - Roger Brooke Taney Statue - Removal and Storage Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0900 (HB0987) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Lefty Grove Statue Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
SB1087 (HB1585) Creation of a State Debt - Garrett County - Friendsville Veterans Memorial Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page