Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Elderly (O2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0282 (SB0091)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0669
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of a Senior Volunteer Corps
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 (HB0282)
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297 /CH0155
Title
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0282 (SB0091) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2015 - 12:00 PM
HB0669 Task Force to Study the Establishment of a Senior Volunteer Corps Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 (HB0282) Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial Studies Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0297 /CH0155 Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term Supports Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page