Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Protection Orders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189
Title
Courts - Peace Orders - Acts Committed Against Employees
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853 (SB0417)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0892 (SB0731)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 (SB0630)
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1230 (SB0490)
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief and Orders to Vacate Home
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0427 (HB0294)
Title
Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 (HB0853)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490 (HB1230)
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 (HB1037)
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0731 (HB0892)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001 /CH0079
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0189 Courts - Peace Orders - Acts Committed Against Employees Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0853 (SB0417) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0892 (SB0731) Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1037 (SB0630) Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1230 (SB0490) Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief and Orders to Vacate Home Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0281 /CH0427 (HB0294) Firearm Safety Act of 2013 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0417 (HB0853) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 (HB1230) Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief Senator Shank 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0630 (HB1037) Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0731 (HB0892) Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1001 /CH0079 Family Law - Protective Orders - Notification of Service - Sunset Extension Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page