Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Publications -see also- Maryland Register

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 /CH0112
Title
Military Department - Powers of the Adjutant General - Summary Courts-Martial
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 /CH0113
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0570
Title
State Government - Inspector General
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 (SB0794)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741
Title
Public Service Commission - New and Changed Rates - Notice Period
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1191 (SB0623)
Title
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1389 (SB0914)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Drugs - Fee Schedule and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0173
Title
Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 /CH0014
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Institutional Renewal Fees and Religious Educational Institutions
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0178
Title
Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623 (HB1191)
Title
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0780
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Agents
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0576)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 (HB1389)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Drugs - Fee Schedule and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0401 /CH0112 Military Department - Powers of the Adjutant General - Summary Courts-Martial Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0420 /CH0113 Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0560 /CH0005 (SB0538) Public-Private Partnerships Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0570 State Government - Inspector General Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0576 (SB0794) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0741 Public Service Commission - New and Changed Rates - Notice Period Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1191 (SB0623) Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB1389 (SB0914) Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Drugs - Fee Schedule and Requirements Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0059 /CH0173 Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0063 /CH0014 Maryland Higher Education Commission - Institutional Renewal Fees and Religious Educational Institutions Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2013 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0083 /CH0178 Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0623 (HB1191) Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0780 Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Agents Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 (HB0576) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0914 (HB1389) Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Drugs - Fee Schedule and Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page