Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Public Corporations and Instrumentalities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726 (SB0384)
Title
Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program
Sponsor
Delegate Turner, V.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779 (SB0368)
Title
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0956 (SB0719)
Title
State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to Employers
Sponsor
Delegate Turner, V.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959 (SB0676/CH0304)
Title
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Bank
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390 /CH0681
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust and Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1418
Title
Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Bonding Authority and Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1438 (SB0962)
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Rate Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368 (HB0779)
Title
Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0384 (HB0726)
Title
Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591
Title
Governmental Procedures - Protection of Personal Information
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0676 /CH0304 (HB0959)
Title
Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0719 (HB0956)
Title
State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to Employers
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0743 (HB0860/CH0647)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844
Title
Public Information Act - Electronic Mail Addresses - Web Site Notice
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0845
Title
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Electronic Mail Addresses
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0880
Title
Public Information Act - Electronic Mail Address - Database and Disclosure
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962 (HB1438)
Title
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Rate Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0726 (SB0384) Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program Delegate Turner, V. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0779 (SB0368) Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements Delegate Tarrant 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0956 (SB0719) State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to Employers Delegate Turner, V. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0959 (SB0676/CH0304) Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information Delegate Lee 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1322 Transportation Infrastructure Bank Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1390 /CH0681 Maryland Veterans Trust and Fund - Establishment Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1418 Maryland Economic Development Corporation - Bonding Authority and Reporting Requirement Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1438 (SB0962) Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Rate Regulation Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0368 (HB0779) Maryland Stem Cell Research Fund - Annual Report - Government Transparency Requirements Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0384 (HB0726) Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program Senator Pugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0591 Governmental Procedures - Protection of Personal Information Senator Pugh 4 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0676 /CH0304 (HB0959) Governmental Procedures - Security and Protection of Information Senator Pugh 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0719 (HB0956) State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to Employers Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0743 (HB0860/CH0647) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0844 Public Information Act - Electronic Mail Addresses - Web Site Notice Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0845 Public Information Act - Required Denials - Electronic Mail Addresses Senator Getty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0880 Public Information Act - Electronic Mail Address - Database and Disclosure Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0962 (HB1438) Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Rate Regulation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page