Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Reapportionment and Redistricting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 (SB0307)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440
Title
Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0477
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0537
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328
Title
General Assembly - Establishment of House Districts (Maryland Fair Representation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362
Title
House Legislative Districts - Single Member
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0307 (HB0356)
Title
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0356 (SB0307) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0440 Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting Delegate McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/09/2018 - 7:30 PM
HB0477 Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0537 Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB1022 Congressional Districts - Standards Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB1328 General Assembly - Establishment of House Districts (Maryland Fair Representation Act) Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/05/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB1362 House Legislative Districts - Single Member Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/05/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0307 (HB0356) General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment Commission President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM
Click to return on the top page