Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Secretary of State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 (SB0185)
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0448 (SB0190/CH0450)
Title
State Government - Notary Public - Appointment
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 (SB0361)
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199
Title
Citizens' Congressional Redistricting Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 (HB0332)
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 /CH0450 (HB0448)
Title
State Government - Notary Public - Appointment
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 (HB0832)
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0706
Title
Referendum Petitions
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0332 (SB0185) Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0448 (SB0190/CH0450) State Government - Notary Public - Appointment Delegate Ready 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0832 (SB0361) Congressional Districting Process Delegate Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1199 Citizens' Congressional Redistricting Commission Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1427 State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0185 (HB0332) Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0190 /CH0450 (HB0448) State Government - Notary Public - Appointment Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0361 (HB0832) Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0376 Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0706 Referendum Petitions Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM
Click to return on the top page