Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Security Interests -see also- Liens; Mechanics' Liens

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186 (SB0101)
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0232 (SB0503)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0255
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0490 /CH0251
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 /CH0428
Title
Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 (SB0837)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Residential Property - Prefile Mediation
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195 (SB0877)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197 (SB0875)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 (HB0186)
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0503 (HB0246/CH0232)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783
Title
Foreclosure Sales of Residential Property - Motion for Deficiency Judgment
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1129)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 (HB1197)
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1195)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0207
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property by Other Entities
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0186 (SB0101) Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0246 /CH0232 (SB0503) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0255 Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0490 /CH0251 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Miscellaneous Revisions Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0511 /CH0428 Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1129 (SB0837) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1168 Real Property - Foreclosure - Residential Property - Prefile Mediation Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1195 (SB0877) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1197 (SB0875) Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0101 (HB0186) Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0503 (HB0246/CH0232) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors Senator Young 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0783 Foreclosure Sales of Residential Property - Motion for Deficiency Judgment Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1129) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0875 (HB1197) Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of Deficiency Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0877 (HB1195) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0909 /CH0207 Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property by Other Entities Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM
Click to return on the top page