Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Summonses -see also- Subpoenas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242
Title
Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil Offense
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's Attorney
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565 /CH0514
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code Violation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 (SB0801)
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 /CH0396 (SB0509/CH0395)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Family Law - Automatic Injunction
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0463
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Expedited Eviction Proceedings - Notice and Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0395 (HB0920/CH0396)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0801 (HB0796)
Title
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891
Title
Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1073
Title
Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0242 Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil Offense Delegate Moon 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0347 Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0359 Criminal Procedure - Charges Against Correctional Officer - Review by State's Attorney Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0565 /CH0514 Criminal Law - Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code Violation Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0796 (SB0801) Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act) Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0920 /CH0396 (SB0509/CH0395) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1120 Family Law - Automatic Injunction Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0463 Landlord and Tenant - Expedited Eviction Proceedings - Notice and Appeals Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 /CH0395 (HB0920/CH0396) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0801 (HB0796) Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0891 Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312) Justice Reinvestment Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
SB1073 Vehicle Laws - Right-of-Way Violations - Death or Serious Bodily Injury - Penalties Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM
Click to return on the top page