Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Time

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems and Work Zone Speed Control Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0094
Title
General Provisions Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0104
Title
General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080 (SB0820)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Discount Plans - Removal of Time Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275 (SB0687/CH0326)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0687 /CH0326 (HB1275)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Electronic Toll Collection - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB1080)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems and Work Zone Speed Control Systems Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0270 /CH0094 General Provisions Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0290 Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environmental Matters
HB0969 /CH0104 General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1080 (SB0820) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1177 Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Discount Plans - Removal of Time Limitations Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1275 (SB0687/CH0326) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers Delegate Frush 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0687 /CH0326 (HB1275) Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, Factory Branches, and Affiliates - Relationship With Dealers Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 326
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 Maryland Transportation Authority - Electronic Toll Collection - Procedures Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0820 (HB1080) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page